CA AB2080 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-22 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-22 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 685 to the Business and Professions Code, to add Sections 5931, 5932, and 5933 to the Corporations Code, to amend Section 1399.65 of, to amend the heading of Article 10.2 (commencing with Section 1399.65) of Chapter 2.2 of Division 2 of, and to add Sections 1255.4 and 1371.26 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10123.149 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care.
Title
Health Care Consolidation and Contracting Fairness Act of 2022.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2080 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 19.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 28). |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on JUD.) |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4359.) |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 685 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Corporations Code | 5931 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Corporations Code | 5932 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Corporations Code | 5933 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1255.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1371.26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1399.65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.149 | New Code | See Bill Text |