CA AB2075 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-13 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-13 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2827.10 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Net energy metering: fuel cell electrical generating
Sponsors
Asm. Paul Fong [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-13 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-14 - Assembly - AB 2075 FONG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-14 - Assembly - AB 2075 FONG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-13 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | |
2012-06-11 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | |
2012-05-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-14 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4819.) | |
2012-05-09 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-08 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 7). | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25502.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2827.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 110 | New Code | See Bill Text |