CA AB2063 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-02 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-02 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 13294 to the Water Code, relating to water quality.
Title
Ex parte communications.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-07-02 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2063 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2063 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-02 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2012-06-18 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2012-05-31 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2012-05-21 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-21 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 8. Page 4924.) | |
2012-05-17 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 16). | |
2012-05-01 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-30 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-26 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 24). | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 13293 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 13294 | New Code | See Bill Text |