CA AB2049 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-17 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-17 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 116380 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water.
Title
Drinking water: point-of-entry and point-of-use treatment systems.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Dahle [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-24 - Assembly - AB 2049 DAHLE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4600.) |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 116380 | Amended Code | Citation Text |