CA AB2047 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4850 of the Labor Code, relating to workers’ compensation.
Title
Workers’ compensation: City of Oceanside.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 4850 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2047 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2047 |