CA AB2022 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 52243 to the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Advanced Placement Test Fee Reimbursement Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 29. |
2020-01-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 52243 | New Code | See Bill Text |