CA AB2019 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 730, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 730, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11148.5, 12098.4, 14836, 14838, 14838.2, 14839, 14840, and 14843 of, and to add Section 14844 to, the Government Code, relating to business development.
Title
Small business enterprises.
Sponsors
Asm. Chris Holden [D] | Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D] | Sen. Dave Min [D] | Asm. Robert Rivas [D] |
Sen. Bob Archuleta [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. Tim Grayson [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2019 Petrie-Norris Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2019 Petrie-Norris et al. By Min (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2019 Petrie-Norris Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2019 Petrie-Norris et al. By Min (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2019 Petrie-Norris Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 730, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 5103.). |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and B., P. & E.D. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5012.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11148.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12098.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14836 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14838 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14838.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14839 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14840 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14843 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14844 | New Code | See Bill Text |