CA AB1996 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 539, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 539, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend an initiative act entitled "An act prescribing the terms upon which licenses may be issued to practitioners of chiropractic, creating the State Board of Chiropractic Examiners and declaring its powers and duties, prescribing penalties for violation thereof, and repealing all acts and parts of acts inconsistent therewith" approved by electors November 7, 1922, by amending Section 12 thereof, relating to chiropractors, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Chiropractors: license renewal fee.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-16 - Assembly - AB 1996 HILL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1996 Hill By Emmerson (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1996 HILL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1996 Hill By Emmerson (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1996 HILL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 539, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-27 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:20 p.m. | |
2010-08-16 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 55. Noes 17. Page 6223.) | |
2010-08-11 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-11 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 4460.) | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 15). | |
2010-06-29 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28). | |
2010-06-03 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-06-01 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2010-05-20 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2010-05-06 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-06 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 8. Page 5031.) | |
2010-05-03 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 28). | |
2010-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-14 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-13 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |
2010-04-08 | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. | |
2010-04-07 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-23 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2010-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2010-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |