CA AB1993 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 631 and 702.5 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment compensation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Unemployment and disability insurance: benefits: in-home supportive services and waiver personal care services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1993 Kamlager Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1993 Kamlager et al. By Pan Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 1993 Kamlager Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1993 Kamlager et al. By Pan Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 1993 Kamlager Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5336.). |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4356.). |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 20). |
2020-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4697.) |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-05-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 27. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 631 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 702.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |