CA AB1992 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14526.4, 14526.7, and 65072.2 of, and to add Section 14522.4 to, the Government Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation: transportation infrastructure: climate change.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 27. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14522.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14526.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14526.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65072.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1992 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1992 |