CA AB1975 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-25 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-25 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 14134.1, 14134.11, and 14134.12 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: medically supportive food and nutrition interventions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1975 Bonta Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1975 Bonta et al. By Smallwood-Cuevas (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 1975 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1975 Bonta et al. By Smallwood-Cuevas (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 1975 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-25 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2024-09-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2024-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 5409.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 16). |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-03-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14134.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14134.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14134.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |