CA AB197 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 297, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 297, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 20516 and 31461 of the Government Code, relating to public employees' retirement.
Title
Public employees' retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-31 - Assembly - AB 197 BUCHANAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-08-31 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB197 Buchanan By DeSaulnier (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB197 Monning By DeSaulnier (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Assembly - AB 197 MONNING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-31 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB197 Buchanan By DeSaulnier (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB197 Monning By DeSaulnier (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Assembly - AB 197 MONNING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 297, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:55 p.m. | |
2012-08-31 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6743.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 4. Page 6743.). | |
2012-08-31 | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 5057.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 5058.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5063.). | |
2012-07-06 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). | |
2012-07-05 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-06-25 | In Senate. Held at Desk. | |
2012-06-25 | From inactive file. Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-09-06 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |
2011-08-31 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-30 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 2170.). | |
2011-06-09 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-06-08 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 8). | |
2011-06-02 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2011-05-05 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-05 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 22. Page 1237.) | |
2011-04-25 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-14 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 13). | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2011-01-28 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 27. | |
2011-01-27 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 20516 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31461 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1194.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1698.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |