CA AB1965 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 10.5 (commencing with Section 18946) to Part 6 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to CalFresh.
Title
California Antihunger Response Act of 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1965 Wicks et al. By Skinner (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1965 Wicks Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1965 Wicks et al. By Skinner (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1965 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1965 Wicks Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1965 Wicks et al. By Skinner (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1965 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 2.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 5237.). |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 3.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (May 19). |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2022-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18946 | New Code | See Bill Text |