CA AB1957 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 20155, 20155.1, 20155.7, and 20155.9 of, and to amend the heading of Article 3.7 (commencing with Section 20155) of Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 2 of, the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: best value construction contracting for counties.
Sponsors
Asm. Lori Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 29. |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 20155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20155.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20155.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20155.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |