CA AB1954 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 207, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 207, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4584 of the Public Resources Code, relating to forestry.
Title
Timber harvest plans: exemption: reducing flammable materials.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Patterson [R] | Asm. Heath Flora [R] | Asm. Vince Fong [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Asm. Randy Voepel [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1954 Patterson et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1954 PATTERSON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1954 PATTERSON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 207, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-08-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5166.). |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5129.) |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2). |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 4584 | Amended Code | Citation Text |