CA AB1940 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 832.19 to the Penal Code, relating to peace officers.
Title
Peace officers: body-worn cameras: policies and procedures.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Cooper [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1940 COOPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1940 COOPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2016-06-28 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 7. Page 5177.) |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5012.) |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 1.) (May 18). |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4389.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4389.) (pending re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P.) |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2016-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 6254.31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 832.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |