CA AB1935 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to Com. on V.A.
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to Com. on V.A.
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 716 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.
Title
Veterans: mental health.
Sponsors
Asm. Randy Voepel [R] | Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] | Asm. Todd Gloria [D] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D] | Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 1935 Voepel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2020-06-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4855.) |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 16. |
2020-01-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 716 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |