CA AB193 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7316, 19011, 19017, 19051, 19059.5, 19060.6, and 19170 of, to add and repeal Section 101.5 of, and to repeal Sections 19010.1 and 19052 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Professions and vocations.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Patterson [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Asm. Steven Choi [R] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] |
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Sen. Melissa Melendez [R] | Sen. Mike Morrell [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Asm. Randy Voepel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 101.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19017 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19051 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19059.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19060.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7316 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB193 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB193 |