CA AB1923 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 14977.1 of the Government Code, relating to public records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government: contracts: public records.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-29AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2014-04-01AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2014-03-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2014-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2014-02-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code14977.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback