CA AB1900 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14005.12 and 14005.13 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: income level for maintenance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-27 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1900 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1900 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4970.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14005.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14005.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |