CA AB1896 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 267, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 267, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 32601 and 32602 of the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Coachella Valley Water District: nonpotable water use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-07 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1896 V. Manuel P (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 1896 PEREZ, V.M. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 1896 PEREZ, V.M. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 267, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4376.). |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4997.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 32601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 32602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |