CA AB1893 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Enrolled on July 3 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 123611 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maternal mental health: federal funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1893 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Assembly - AB 1893 MAIENSCHEIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-07-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-04-19SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-19AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4782.)
2018-04-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-09AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4).
2018-03-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-06AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-02-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-01-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 18.
2018-01-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code123611New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback