CA AB189 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-01 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-01 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8051 and 19951 of, and to add Section 19440.1 to, the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 51.7, 52, 54.3, 4225, and 6606 of the Civil Code, to amend Section 67380 of the Education Code, to amend Sections 3527, 7903, 8310.7, 8310.8, 9112, 9112.5, 11136, 11343, 11512, 11540, 12804, 12901, 12903, 12907, 12925, 12935, 12940, 12940.3, 12944, 12945, 12965, 13957, 14692, 15670, 15676.2, 18720, 18720.2, 18720.3, 18720.4, 19704, 50085.5, and 65040 of, to amend the headings of Part 2.8 (commencing with Section 12900) of Division 3 of Title 2 of, and Article 2 (commencing with Section 12935) of Chapter 5 of Part 2.8 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, to add Sections 8286.5, 8310.6, 11540.5, 12482, and 12816.5 to, to add Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 16343) to Part 2 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, and Article 5.5 (commencing with Section 65052) to Chapter 1.5 of Division 1 of Title 7 of, and to add and repeal Section 11133 of, and to add and repeal Article 5.10 (commencing with Section 8590.15) of Chapter 7 of Division 1 of Title 2 of, and to repeal Section 15676.5 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 1262.6 and 17008.5 of, and to add Section 131052.5 to, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 107.5, 1156.3, 1424, 1429, 1429.5, 1430, 1684, 1697.5, 1700.50, 1700.52, 3073, and 3073.9 of the Labor Code, to amend Sections 243.4, 422.92, and 679.10 of the Penal Code, to add Section 95.60 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Sections 1095 and 14034 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, and to amend Section 11216.2 of the Vehicle Code, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State Government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 189 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 189 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (June 27). |
2022-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2022-06-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 506.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |