CA AB1868 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 428, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 51934 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil instruction: sexual health education: sexually suggestive or sexually explicit materials.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1868 CUNNINGHAM Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1868 Cunningham By Galgiani (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Assembly - AB 1868 CUNNINGHAM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 428, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-17 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6807.).
2018-08-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-23SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5648.).
2018-08-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-07SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-06-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13).
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-05-22SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5245.)
2018-05-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-01-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-01-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
2018-01-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code51934Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback