CA AB1851 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 104, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 104, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 46601 of the Education Code, relating to school attendance.
Title
School attendance: interdistrict attendance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1851 Bradford (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1851 BRADFORD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1851 BRADFORD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 104, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:15 p.m. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4142.). |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 5099.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 46601 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |