CA AB185 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 534, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 14516 of the Government Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Transportation Commission: transportation and transportation-related policies: joint meetings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 185 Grayson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB185 Grayson et al. By Beall (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 185 Grayson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 534, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-07 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-12AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3151.).
2019-09-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-05SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 2572.).
2019-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 30).
2019-07-01SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-24SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-19SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-12SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-11SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 11).
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-05-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1588.)
2019-05-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1).
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-02-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-01-11AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
2019-01-10AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code14516Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback