CA AB1845 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 12095) to Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 8256 and 8257 of, and to add Section 8257.5 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homelessness: Office to End Homelessness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1845 Luz Rivas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1845 Luz Rivas et al. By Wiener (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 1845 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-15AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 5.).
2020-08-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 2.).
2020-08-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-27SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-25SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20).
2020-08-17SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-08-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-08-10SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 10).
2020-07-21SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2020-06-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0.)
2020-06-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-03-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-03-11AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2020-01-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2020-01-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
2020-01-06AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12095New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code8256Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code8257Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code8257.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback