CA AB1834 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 69957 of the Government Code, relating to courts.
Title
Electronic court reporting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Testimony taken. |
2016-03-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2016-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 69957 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1834&sess=1516&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1801-1850/ab_1834_bill_20160209_introduced.html |