CA AB1832 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 433, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 433, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6303 of, and to repeal and add Section 6900 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to public resources.
Title
Waters subject to tidal influence: hard mineral extraction.
Sponsors
Asm. Luz Rivas [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Sen. John Laird [D] | Sen. Monique Limon [D] |
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Assembly - AB 1832 Luz Rivas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1832 Luz Rivas et al. By Laird (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1832 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1832 Luz Rivas et al. By Laird (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1832 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 433, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5140.). |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 4575.) |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 6303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 6900 | New Code | See Bill Text |