CA AB1819 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 85320 of, and to add Section 82007.5 to, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: contributions and expenditures by foreign-influenced business entities.
Sponsors
Asm. Alex Lee [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 27). |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 82007.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 85320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |