CA AB1812 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 36, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 36, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4021.5, 4052.2, 4057, 4081, and 4400 of, to add Section 4203.6 to, and to add Article 13.5 (commencing with Section 4187) to Chapter 9 of Division 2 of, the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 12838.1, 13332.09, 14670, and 15820.913 of the Government Code, to amend Section 103680 of, and to add Section 1797.165 to, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 680.3, 832.6, 1170, 4115.5, 6031.4, 6040, and 13603 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 13523 of, to add Sections 2067 and 3007.08 to, and to add and repeal Sections 6402.5 and 13509 of, the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 607, 912, 1178, 1731.5, 1769, and 1771 of, to add Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 1450) to Part 1 of Division 2 of, and to add and repeal Section 1731.7 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public safety, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public safety omnibus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - AB 1812 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1812 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1812 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1812 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1812 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 36, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 5858.). |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 5854.) |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 5854.) |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 4728.). |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (June 18). |
2018-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5100.) |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.) |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |