CA AB1812 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 265, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 265, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 128766 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.
Title
Health facilities: information: disclosure.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-07 - Assembly - AB 1812 PAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1812 Pan (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - AB 1812 PAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1812 Pan (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - AB 1812 PAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 265, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5898.). |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4143.). |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4599.) |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 128766 | Amended Code | Citation Text |