CA AB1808 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5777.8 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster children.
Title
Medi-Cal: mental health services: foster children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2010-05-05 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-20 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-19 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |
2010-04-06 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2010-04-05 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | |
2010-02-10 | Read first time. To print. |