CA AB1793 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1353.8 of the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments.
Title
Common interest developments: artificial turf.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1793 Saldana By Ducheny (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1793 SALDANA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Housing and Community Development (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1793 SALDANA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Housing and Community Development (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-08-26 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. | |
2010-08-18 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-18 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 4579.) | |
2010-06-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-06-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 15). | |
2010-05-06 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2010-04-22 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-04-22 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 4812.) | |
2010-04-21 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-20 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-04-19 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14). | |
2010-03-11 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 11). | |
2010-03-04 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent. | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | |
2010-02-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | |
2010-02-10 | Read first time. To print. |