CA AB1790 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 338, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 338, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 7.7 (commencing with Section 122475) to Division 105 of, and to repeal Section 122477 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to valley fever.
Title
Valley Fever Education, Early Diagnosis, and Treatment Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1790 SALAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1790 Salas et al. By Galgiani (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-22 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1790 Salas et al. By Galgiani (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 1790 SALAS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1790 Salas et al. By Galgiani (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-22 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1790 Salas et al. By Galgiani (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 1790 SALAS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 338, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6868.). |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5826.). |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 22) |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5110.). |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5213.) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 8. |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2190.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 122475 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 122477 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1233.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1257.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |