CA AB1789 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 147.7 to the Labor Code, relating to occupational safety and health.
Title
Occupational safety and health: Valley Fever.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 8. |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 147.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |