CA AB1773 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 67, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to the payment of claims against the state, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Claims against the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1773 APPR. (Gonzalez Fletcher) Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1773 APPR. Third Reading Urgency By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 67, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-09 Approved by the Governor.
2018-07-05AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
2018-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-07-02SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5035.).
2018-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25).
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-25SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5303.).
2018-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23).
2018-05-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2018-01-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on APPR.
2018-01-05AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
2018-01-04AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback