CA AB1768 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 354, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 354, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19515, 19521, and 19596.2 of, and to add Section 19438 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 337.9 and 830.3 of the Penal Code, relating to horse racing.
Title
Horse racing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-28 - Assembly - AB 1768 G.O. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By RUBIO (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1768 G.O. (Blanca Rubio) By Dodd (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1768 Governmental Organization Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1768 G.O. (Blanca Rubio) By Dodd (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1768 Governmental Organization Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 354, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.). |
2024-06-25 | Senate | From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 25) |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-06-03 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dodd. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1466.) |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 22. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 22. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19438 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19515 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19521 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19596.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 337.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 830.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |