CA AB1765 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 17053.44 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Personal income taxes: credits: qualified disaster area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.) |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2018-01-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 4. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 27388.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.44 | New Code | See Bill Text |