CA AB1763 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 25303.6 to the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.
Title
State energy plan for 2030 and 2050.
Sponsors
Asm. Henry Perea [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 1763 PEREA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E.Q. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 3. Page 5010.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 14). |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 25303.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |