CA AB1746 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-13 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-13 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8421, 66010.91, 66010.93, 66018.5, 66025.3, 66025.9, 66093.3, 67003.5, 67380, 67453, 68120, 68121, 69000, 69438.3, 69438.5, 69465, 69470, 69506, 69511, 69513.2, 69514, 69519, 69550, 69999.16, 69999.18, 76300, 78221, 78261.5, 88931, 89295, and 92675 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 1.7 (commencing with Section 69430) of Part 42 of Division 5 of Title 3 of, to amend and repeal Section 66021.2 of, to add Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 69405) to, and to add and repeal Article 11 (commencing with Section 69475) of Chapter 1.7 of, Part 42 of Division 5 of Title 3 of, the Education Code, to amend Section 4709 of the Labor Code, and to amend Section 5024 of the Vehicle Code, relating to student financial aid.
Title
Student financial aid: Cal Grant Reform Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1746 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1746 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-13 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |