CA AB1729 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 237, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 237, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18974.5 of the Government Code, relating to civil service examinations.
Title
Civil service examinations: veterans' preference.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-12 - Assembly - AB 1729 YAMADA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-09 - Senate - Special Consent #30 AB1729 Yamada (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1729 YAMADA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs to Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-09 - Senate - Special Consent #30 AB1729 Yamada (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1729 YAMADA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs to Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 237, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-08-25 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:50 p.m. | |
2010-08-12 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6155.) | |
2010-08-09 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-09 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4409.) | |
2010-08-04 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-03 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-06-23 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22). | |
2010-06-21 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on V.A. | |
2010-06-15 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). | |
2010-05-20 | Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and V.A. | |
2010-05-06 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-06 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5052.) | |
2010-05-03 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-04-29 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 28). | |
2010-04-14 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |
2010-04-07 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 7). | |
2010-03-22 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. | |
2010-03-18 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Coms. on P.E.,R. & S.S. and V.A. | |
2010-02-04 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. | |
2010-02-03 | Read first time. To print. |