CA AB1713 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wiener.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wiener.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 21800 and 22450 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: required stops: bicycles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1713 Boerner Horvath Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1713 Boerner Horvath Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wiener. |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 20. Page 5025.) |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (May 4). |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 21800 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 22450 | New Code | See Bill Text |