CA AB1711 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1798.29 of the Civil Code, relating to privacy.
Title
Privacy: breach.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Assembly - AB 1711 Seyarto Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1711 Seyarto By Jones (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1711 Seyarto Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1711 Seyarto By Jones (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1711 Seyarto Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-23 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 1.). |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 2. Page 5013.). |
2022-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4654.) |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |