CA AB1671 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 855, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 855, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 632, 633.5, and 637.2 of, and to add Section 632.01 to, the Penal Code, relating to confidential communications.
Title
Confidential communications: disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1671 GOMEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ( Supplemental File 2)AB 1671 Go mez By (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1671 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ( Supplemental File 2)AB 1671 Go mez By (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1671 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 855, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6569.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 6574.). |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5557.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5578.). |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5510.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28). |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 5014.) |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 25). |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 19). |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 18. |
2016-01-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 632 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 632.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 633.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 637.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |