CA AB167 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 252, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 252, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8281.5, 14041, 17375, 33540.2, 33540.4, 33540.6, 41020, 41422, 41480, 41590, 42238.01, 43521, 43522, 44230.6, 44252, 44257.2, 45500, 46120, 46392, 46393, 48000, 49066.5, 49421, 49429, 49501.5, 51226.9, 51745, 51745.5, 51747, 51747.5, 51749.5, 51749.6, and 56836.146 of, and to amend and renumber Section 49422 of, the Education Code, to amend Section 110 of Chapter 24 of the Statutes of 2020, and to amend Sections 124, 127, 134, 138, 141, 144, 149, 152, 157, 159, and 164 of Chapter 44 of the Statutes of 2021, relating to education finance, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Education finance: education omnibus budget trailer bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 167 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB167 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 167 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB167 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 167 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 252, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3051.). |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 19. Page 3049.) |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2576.). |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 7). |
2021-09-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2303.) |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Senate rules suspended. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2302.) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 495.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |