CA AB1644 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14124.27 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: Drug Medi-Cal Program providers.
Sponsors
Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 1). |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2014-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14124.23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14124.27 | New Code | See Bill Text |