CA AB1638 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1524 of the Penal Code, relating to search warrants.
Title
Search warrants: vehicle recording devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-19 - Assembly - AB 1638 Obernolte Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1638 Obernolte By Wiener (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1638 Obernolte Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1638 Obernolte By Wiener (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1638 Obernolte Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-08-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 9. Page 2749.). |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 2181.). |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 7. Page 1571.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1524 | Amended Code | Citation Text |