CA AB1606 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 26, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 26, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1180.4 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 10430 of the Public Contract Code, to amend Sections 4519.5, 4659.2, 4681.5, 4681.6, 4685.8, 4690.5, 4691.6, 4691.9, and 4870 of, to add Sections 4437, 4474.15, 4474.6, and 4572 to, and to repeal Section 4435.1 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, and to amend Section 15 of Chapter 3 of the Statutes of 2016, Second Extraordinary Session, relating to developmental services, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Developmental services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - Assembly - AB 1606 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 65 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1606 Committee On BUDGET (Ting) By Leno (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1606 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1606 Committee On BUDGET (Ting) By Leno (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1606 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 26, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5392.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5392.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 13. Page 5395.). |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4376.). |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (June 15). Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 4327.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 4573.) |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 4488.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1180.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 10430 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4435.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4437 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4474.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4474.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4519.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4572 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4659.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4681.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4681.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4685.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4690.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4691.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4691.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4870 | Amended Code | Citation Text |