CA AB1598 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 810, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 810, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1720 of the Labor Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: public works: installation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1598 Buchanan By DeSaulnier (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Assembly - AB 1598 BUCHANAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Assembly - AB 1598 BUCHANAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 810, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-22 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2012-08-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4702.). | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). | |
2012-07-02 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-25 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-06-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2012-04-30 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-04-30 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 24. Page 4592.) | |
2012-04-26 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4559.) | |
2012-04-19 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-18 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 18). | |
2012-03-29 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-02-17 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2012-02-07 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. | |
2012-02-06 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1720 | Amended Code | Citation Text |